Mathekiste 4 / D 03

Allerlei / Übung 1

700 * 3 = * 900 = 5400600 * = 3600
900 * = 810070 * 50 = * 300 = 2700
* 800 = 5600400 * = 280060 * 70=
60 * 80 = * 30 = 240080 * = 4000
* 900 = 450060 * 40 = 600 * = 4800
700 * = 6300 800 * 4 = * 60 = 5400
* 80 = 6400 20 * = 1800 40 * 40 =
900 * 4 = * 700 = 5600 60 * = 4200
800 *   = 7200 60 * 50 = * 70 = 3500
* 70 = 2100 90 * = 4500 80 * 40 =


zurück