Mathekiste 4 / D 04

Allerlei / Übung 2

40 * = 60 * 60

60 * 80 = * 120

50 * = 100 * 45

50 * 40 = * 25

60 * 70 = * 300

* 80 = 2500 + 700

220 * = 3620 - 1200

* 660 = 33 * 200

49 * = 4000 - 8

* 90 = 600 * 12

70 * = 6260 - 1360

* 110 = 2390 + 3660

160 * = 4860 + 4740

* 150 = 3780 + 5220

700 * = 2100 * 4

* 250 = 3300 + 3200

* 70 = 9900 - 3600

60 * = 12 * 250

88 * = 44 * 44

33 * = 66 * 30


zurück